EP2923811 - An injection mold, injection molding tool comprising the injection mold, methods of their uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/40] | An injection mold, injection molding tool comprising the injection mold, methods of theirs uses and objects obtained. | ||
[2017/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastics Unbound GmbH Hertensteinstrasse 51 6004 Luzern / CH | [2018/02] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Plastics Unbound Ltd Sheikh Zayed Road 2nd floor, Office 201 Dubai / AE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Axelsson, Robert Högaberg 30 56391 Gränna / SE | 02 /
Franksson, Olof Mörbyhöjden 22 , 5tr 182 32 Danderyd / SE | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 14162238.1 | 28.03.2014 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2923811 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923811 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/04 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
B29C33/04 (EP);
B29C2033/042 (EP);
B29C45/40 (EP);
B29C45/7312 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 23.03.2016 | ME | 23.03.2016 | Title | German: | Spritzgießform, Spritzgießwerkzeug mit der Spritzgießform, Verfahren zur ihrer Verwendungen | [2017/08] | English: | An injection mold, injection molding tool comprising the injection mold, methods of their uses | [2017/35] | French: | Moule à injection, outil de moulage par injection comprenant le moule à injection, leurs procédés d'utilisation | [2017/08] |
Former [2015/40] | Spritzgießform, Spritzgießwerkzeug mit der Spritzgießform, Verfahren zur ihrer Verwendungen und hergestellte Artikel | ||
Former [2015/40] | An injection mold, injection molding tool comprising the injection mold, methods of theirs uses and objects obtained. | ||
Former [2015/40] | Moule à injection, outil de moulage par injection comprenant le moule à injection, leurs procédés d'utilisation et objets obtenus | Examination procedure | 23.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17192854.2 / EP3292970 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9731733 (AEROQUIP CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6,12-15 * Fig.4 reference numerals 40,50,130,140,170,104;; figure 4 * [Y] 4; | [Y]GB2478796 (RODLSBERGER ALFRED [AT], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH1029215 (TOHOKU MUNEKATA KK) [A] 1-15 * . * | by applicant | WO2013126723 | WO03011550 | EP20130191336 |