EP2789675 - Gasification reactor system with at least one gasification reactor for producing a combustible gas mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nyenhuis, Markus Landersum 18 48485 Neuenkirchen / DE | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Tarvenkorn, Oliver Tarvenkorn & Wickord Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bernhard-Ernst-Straße 12 48155 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Tarvenkorn, Oliver Patentanwaltskanzlei Haus Sentmaring 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 14162782.8 | 31.03.2014 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | DE201310103500 | 08.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013103500 | DE201310103844 | 16.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013103844 | [2014/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2789675 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/30, B65G53/46 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
C10J3/30 (EP);
C10J2200/156 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vergasungsreaktorsystem mit wenigstens einem Vergasungsreaktor zur Erzeugung eines brennbaren Gasgemisches | [2014/42] | English: | Gasification reactor system with at least one gasification reactor for producing a combustible gas mixture | [2014/42] | French: | Système de réacteur de gazéification comprenant au moins un réacteur de gazéification pour la génération d'un mélange de gaz combustible | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 16.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/44] | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4244705 (SEIDL ROBERT M, et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figure 1 * [Y] 3-6 [I] 8-12; | [YA]US4231495 (LUND ARVID) [Y] 3-6 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, lines 7-28 * [A] 1,2,7-12; | [XA]DE1054199 (KOHLENSCHEIDUNGS GMBH) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * [A] 3-12; | [XA]CH245792 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-2 * [A] 3-12 | by applicant | EP1436364 |