EP2790200 - Input apparatus for electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Junghyun C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 02 /
Baek, Seungchul C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Byounguk C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jaeryang C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 14162815.6 | 31.03.2014 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | KR20130040064 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: KR 20130040064 | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2790200 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2790200 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2790200 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/705 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
H01H13/705 (EP,US);
G06F3/02 (KR);
H01H13/10 (US);
H01H13/14 (KR);
H01H2221/058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Eingabevorrichtung für elektronische Vorrichtung | [2014/42] | English: | Input apparatus for electronic device | [2014/42] | French: | Appareil d'entrée pour dispositif électronique | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 29.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2014 | AL | 03.02.2016 | AT | 03.02.2016 | BE | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | CZ | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | ES | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | HR | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | MK | 03.02.2016 | MT | 03.02.2016 | PL | 03.02.2016 | RO | 03.02.2016 | RS | 03.02.2016 | SE | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SK | 03.02.2016 | SM | 03.02.2016 | TR | 03.02.2016 | IE | 31.03.2016 | LU | 31.03.2016 | BG | 03.05.2016 | NO | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | PT | 03.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 31.03.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
TR | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 31.03.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
LU | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.03.2014 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MT | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
IE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
ES | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB2054270 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * abstract * [A] 3 [I] 5,6,9,10; | [A]US2010300858 (TING YU-HSIANG [TW], et al) [A] 1* abstract * |