EP2754449 - Pharmaceutical composition for treating a metabolic syndrome [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2017 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sommerfeld, Mark c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Schaefer, Hans-Ludwig c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
Boscheinen, Oliver c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
Habermann, Paul c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 05 /
Rao, Ercole c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 06 /
Dreyer, Matthias c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Böhmer, Thomas, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Timmerbeil, Björn Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Global Intellectual Property Department Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 703 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 14163127.5 | 21.01.2011 | [2014/29] | Priority number, date | EP20100305070 | 21.01.2010 Original published format: EP 10305070 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2754449 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K38/26, A61P3/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/1825 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/155 (KR);
A61K31/4985 (KR);
A61K45/06 (IL,KR,US);
A61P3/00 (EP,RU);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/50 (IL,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR);
C07K2319/30 (IL,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1825, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2014/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 30.01.2015 | ME | 30.01.2015 | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung eines metabolischen Syndroms | [2014/29] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition for treating a metabolic syndrome | [2014/29] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique pour le traitement d'un syndrome métabolique | [2014/29] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/07] | 10.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2017 | 26.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11700669.2 / EP2525807 | Divisional application(s) | EP16205881.2 / EP3216459 | EP18162214.3 / EP3357503 | EP19195239.9 / EP3607964 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 14.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9819698 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [Y]JP2002112772 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [Y]WO03011213 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al); | [X]US2008255045 (CUJEC THOMAS P [US], et al); | [X]WO2009020802 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al); | [XP]WO2010142665 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | by applicant | EP0254516 | EP0280534 | US5618913 | US5750497 | US6011007 | WO03011213 | WO2004110472 | WO2005061712 | WO2005072769 | WO2005091944 | WO2005113606 | US2006003417 | WO2006028595 | WO2006028714 | WO2006050247 | WO2006065582 | WO2008121563 | WO2009089396 |