EP2927443 - Apparatus and method for detecting urea deposit formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silver, Ronald 5631 North Prospect Road Peoria, IL Illinois 61614 / US | 02 /
Reid, Benjamin 255 Beacon Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 2QZ / GB | 03 /
Steffen, Thomas Caterpillar Legal Services Division c/o Perkins Engines Company Limited Eastfield Peterborough, PE1 5NA / GB | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Hendry, Niall James Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 14163211.7 | 02.04.2014 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2927443 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/02, F01N3/20 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP,CN,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/9418 (US);
B01D53/9495 (US);
F01N11/002 (US);
F01N13/008 (US);
F02D41/0245 (US);
F01N2550/05 (EP,CN,US);
F01N2560/12 (EP,CN,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,CN,US);
F01N2610/146 (EP,CN,US);
F01N2610/1493 (EP,CN,US);
F01N2900/16 (US);
F02D2200/08 (US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Detektion von Harnstoffablagerungsbildung | [2015/41] | English: | Apparatus and method for detecting urea deposit formation | [2015/41] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la détection de la formation de dépôts d'urée | [2015/41] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE10358495 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0029] *; | [AD]US2013192206 (KEGHELIAN PATRICE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A]EP0675267 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]US2013074590 (BERTOW THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2012291419 (SNOPKO MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * abstract * | by applicant | US2013192206 |