EP2770784 - WIRELESS PERSONAL AREA NETWORK (PAN) END DEVICE IMPLEMENTING POWER SAVINGS BY TRANSITIONING BETWEEN ACTIVE AND SLEEP STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bornstein, Gilad 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
Eruchimovitch, Baruch 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
Strauss, Nir 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, 92121-1714 / US | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14163342.0 | 11.05.2011 | [2014/35] | Priority number, date | US20100777527 | 11.05.2010 Original published format: US 777527 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2770784 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04W84/18 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
H04W52/0251 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04W52/0212 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | WPAN-Endgerät mit Energieeinsparung mittels Übergang zwischen aktivem Modus und Ruhemodus | [2014/35] | English: | WIRELESS PERSONAL AREA NETWORK (PAN) END DEVICE IMPLEMENTING POWER SAVINGS BY TRANSITIONING BETWEEN ACTIVE AND SLEEP STATES | [2014/35] | French: | Dispositif de réseau personnel radio (WPAN) économisant l'énergie par des transitions entre états actifs et veille | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/50] | 06.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11721902.2 / EP2569992 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010077404 (OH HYUN-WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0110] *; | [A]US2010115302 (CHO KOON SHIK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A] - JURDAK R ET AL, "Adaptive Radio Modes in Sensor Networks: How Deep to Sleep?", SENSOR, MESH AND AD HOC COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, 2008. SECON '08. 5TH ANNUAL IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080616), ISBN 978-1-4244-1777-3, pages 386 - 394, XP031282614 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * par. B. IEEE 802.15.4; page 387 * * page 388, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 20 * | [A] - IEEE Computer Society, "IEEE Std 802.15.4-2006 (Revision of IEEE Std 802.15.4-2003); Part 15.4: Wireless Medium Access Control (MAC) and Physical Layer (PHY) Specifications for Low-Rate WirelessPersonal Area Networks (WPANs); pages 1-24 and 166-169", IEEE Std 802.15.4, New York, USA, (20060908), IEEE, 3 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016-5997, USA, URL: http://standards.ieee.org/getieee802/download/802.15.4-2006.pdf, (20110802), XP002656040 [A] 1-15 * page 5, par. 3.7 and par. 3.9; page 6, par. 3.33; page 7, par. 3.44; pages 14/15, par. 5.3 and par. 5.3.1; pages 17/18, par. 5.5.1, Figs. 4 and 5; page 20, par. 5.5.2.2, Figs. 8 and 9; page 167, par. 7.5.1.1 * | [A] - TAE RIM PARK ET AL, "Power saving algorithms for wireless sensor networks on IEEE 802.15.4", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20080601), vol. 46, no. 6, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2008.4539479, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 148 - 155, XP011227797 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 149, column 1, line 18 - line 34 * * page 149, column 2, line 14 - line 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2008.4539479 |