EP2799657 - Guiding device, fabric of a solar protection device, and assembly provided with such a guiding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serge Ferrari SAS Zone Industrielle de la Tour du Pin 38110 Saint Jean de Soudain / FR | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saiz, Carlos 170 Chemin du Burdet 73190 Challes les eaux / FR | [2015/33] |
Former [2014/45] | 01 /
Saiz, Carlos 170 Chemin du Burdet 73190 CHALLES LES EAUX / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2014/45] | Application number, filing date | 14163475.8 | 03.04.2014 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | FR20130053053 | 04.04.2013 Original published format: FR 1353053 | [2014/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799657 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799657 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/42, E06B9/58 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
E06B9/58 (EP);
E06B9/42 (EP);
F16B5/0692 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2014/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Führungsvorrichtung, Sonnenschutztuch und Anordnung ausgesattet mit dieser Führungsvorrichtung | [2014/45] | English: | Guiding device, fabric of a solar protection device, and assembly provided with such a guiding device | [2014/45] | French: | Dispositif de guidage, toile de store de protection solaire et ensemble équipés d'un tel dispositif de guidage | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 15.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2014 | AL | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MK | 12.08.2015 | MT | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | RS | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | SM | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | IE | 03.04.2016 | LU | 03.04.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 03.04.2014 | |
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2016 | ||
LU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 03.04.2014 | |
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2016 | ||
LU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.04.2014 | |
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2016 | ||
LU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.04.2014 | |
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2016 | ||
LU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | EE | 12.08.2015 | |
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2016 | ||
LU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | EE | 12.08.2015 | |
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 12.08.2015 | |
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | EE | 12.08.2015 | |
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | HR | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2335956 (ADVANCED COMFORT SYSTEMS FRANCE SAS ACS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]EP0818602 (FERRARI S TISSAGE & ENDUCT SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 14 - line 56; figures 1,4-8 *; | [A]DE7832604U (DOLENZ ERNST) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO03048497 (DYNACO INTERNATIONAL SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 3 - line 29; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US2012325416 |