EP2792487 - Rotary screen printing screen, mounting device, coating device, exposure apparatus and washing device with quick clamping lock coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gallus Ferd. Rüesch AG Harzbüchelstrasse 34 9016 St. Gallen / CH | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brocker, Heinz Bertold-Suhner-Straße 12 CH - 9100 Herisau / CH | 02 /
Lehner, Martin Ebnetstraße 18 CH-9032 Engelburg / CH | 03 /
Muina, Martin Turnerstraße 30 CH-9000 St. Gallen / CH | 04 /
Zellweger, Stefan Saumstraße 15 CH-9100 Herisau / CH | 05 /
Frick, Hans-Rudolf Sonnhaldenweg 32 CH 9100 Herisau / CH | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Martin Richard Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Fritz, Martin Richard Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14163481.6 | 04.04.2014 | [2014/43] | Priority number, date | DE20131006698 | 18.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013006698 | [2014/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792487 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/38 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
B41F15/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2014/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rotationssiebdrucksieb, Montagevorrichtung, Beschichtungsvorrichtung, Belichtungsvorrichtung und Waschvorrichtung mit Klemmschnellverschluss | [2014/43] | English: | Rotary screen printing screen, mounting device, coating device, exposure apparatus and washing device with quick clamping lock coupling | [2014/43] | French: | Tamis de sérigraphie rotative, dispositif de montage, dispositif de revetement, dispositif d'éclairage et dispositif de lavage doté d'une fermeture de serrage rapide | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 23.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 02.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP2347900 (STORK PRINTS AMERICA INC [US]) [YD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO8503672 (LOCKWOOD TECH [US]) [Y] 1-12 * siehe Zusammenfassung; page 3; figures 1,4,7-10 * * page 21, paragraph l - page 25, line 1 *; | [YD]EP0338612 (STORK X CEL BV [NL]) [YD] 11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1785272 (BUSER AG MASCHF FRITZ) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2637229 (ZIMMER JOHANNES) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3525795 (RUEESCH FERD AG) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9919146 (GALLUS FERD RUEESCH AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9919146 | DE3525795 | DE68902168T | EP2347900 |