EP2928211 - Self-calibration of multi-microphone noise reduction system for hearing assistance devices using an auxiliary device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Jesper Oticon A/S c/o Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
Pedersen, Michael Syskind Oticon A/S c/o Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Hans Jørgen Vind Demant A/S IP Management Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Nielsen, Hans Jørgen Vind Oticon A/S IP Management Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Application number, filing date | 14163499.8 | 04.04.2014 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928211 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H04R25/407 (EP,US);
H04R25/30 (US);
H04R25/50 (US);
H04R3/002 (US);
A61N1/36039 (EP,US);
H04R2225/41 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Selbstkalibrierung eines Multimikrofongeräuschunterdrückungssystems für Hörgeräte mit einer zusätzlichen Vorrichtung | [2015/41] | English: | Self-calibration of multi-microphone noise reduction system for hearing assistance devices using an auxiliary device | [2015/41] | French: | Auto-étalonnage de système de réduction de bruit à multiples microphones pour dispositifs d'assistance auditive utilisant un dispositif auxiliaire | [2015/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US7995771 (FALTYS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,15,17,18 * column 1, lines 27-41, 35-36, 52-54; figures 5B, 5C, 5D, 6 * * column 2, lines 14-17, 63-65; claim 2 * * column 3, lines 5-12, 28-30; claims 1-12 * * column 6, lines 11-19, 36-43, 51-56 * * column 7, lines 61-65 * * column 8, lines 18-40 * * column 9, lines 2-5, 42-50 * * column 10, lines 29-32, 41-43 * * column 11, lines 61-62 * * column 12, lines 16-27, 51-54 * [Y] 6,12,13 [I] 4,9-11,14,16; | [YA]US2013094664 (RUWISCH DIETMAR [DE]) [Y] 6 * figures 3-5 * * paragraphs [0003] , [ 25 ] - [0029] - [0 39] * [A] 1-5,7-18; | [A]US2011064232 (RUWISCH DIETMAR [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0027] - [0035]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0047] *; | [A]US2013343585 (BENNETT JAMES D [CZ], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] , [0052] , [0054] , [0061] , [0062] , [0110] , [0166] , [0173] * * figures 5,7,9 *; | [A]DE202006002322U (AURIC HOERSYSTEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [YA] - VAN VEEN B D ET AL, "Beamforming: a versatile approach to spatial filtering", IEEE ASSP MAGAZINE, IEEE, US, (19880401), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1109/53.665, ISSN 0740-7467, pages 4 - 24, XP011437205 [Y] 6,12,13 * sections "B. Use of Reference Signal" and "C. Maximization of Signal to Noise Ratio"; page 14 * * abstract * [A] 1-5,7-11,14-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/53.665 | [YDA] - U. KJEMS; J. JENSEN, "Maximum likelihood based noise covariance matrix estimation for multi-microphone speech enhancement", 20TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, (2012), pages 295 - 299, XP032254727 [YD] 6,12,13 * abstract * * page 297, column right, lines 13-16 * * sections 4.1, 4.2 * [A] 1-5,7-11,14-18 | [A] - WU Y I ET AL, "Beacon-Aided Adaptive Localization of Noise Sources Aboard a Pass-By Railcar Using a Trackside Microphone Array", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20101001), vol. 59, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 3720 - 3727, XP011313906 [A] 1-18 * abstract * * p. 3721, left col., l. 21 - right col., l. 4;; figure 1 * * section "VI. CONCLUSION" * | by applicant | US2011026725 | - U. KJEMS; J. JENSEN, "Maximum likelihood based noise covariance matrix estimation for multi-microphone speech enhancement", 20TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, (2012), pages 295 - 299, XP032254727 |