EP2754376 - Method and apparatus for cartridge-based carbonation of beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. 33 Coffee Lane Waterbury, VT 05676 / US | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Novak, Thomas J P.O. Box 3167 Stowe, VT Vermont 05672 / US | 02 /
Packard, Ross 40 Proctor Avenue South Burlington, VT Vermont 05403 / US | 03 /
Peterson, Peter c/o Green Mountain Coffee Roasters, Inc. 33 Coffee Lane Waterbury, VT Vermont 05676 / US | 04 /
Gulla, Shawn 37 Sligo Lane Grand Isle, VT Vermont 05458 / US | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Barker, Rosemary Anne, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [2014/29] | Application number, filing date | 14163831.2 | 31.01.2011 | [2014/29] | Priority number, date | US20100337184P | 01.02.2010 Original published format: US 337184 P | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2754376 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2754376 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/41, A47J31/40, B01F3/04, A23L2/40 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
B65D85/8049 (EP,CN,US);
A47J31/41 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47J31/407 (EP,CN,US);
B67D1/0406 (US);
A23L2/40 (KR);
A23L2/54 (EP,CN,US);
A47J31/00 (KR);
A47J31/44 (KR);
B01F23/20 (KR);
B01F23/23 (KR);
B01F23/2362 (EP,CN,US);
B01F35/713 (EP,CN,US);
B01F35/7131 (EP,CN,US);
B65D85/8061 (EP,CN,US);
Y10S261/07 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0385 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung Für Kartuschenbasierte Karbonisierung von Getränken | [2014/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for cartridge-based carbonation of beverages | [2014/29] | French: | Procédé et Appareil de Carbonatation de Boissons Avec Cartouche | [2014/29] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 21.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11702766.4 / EP2531080 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2011 | AL | 25.03.2015 | AT | 25.03.2015 | BE | 25.03.2015 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MK | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | RS | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | SM | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MK | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MK | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.01.2011 | |
AT | 25.03.2015 | ||
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MK | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
RS | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4025655 (WHYTE DAVID D, et al) [AD] 1,3,4,8-10 * column 12, line 4 - column 13, line 6 * * column 13, line 59 - column 15, line 28 * * figures 3,4,7-10 *; | [A]US5182084 (PLESTER GEORGE [DE]) [A] 11,16 * page 8, lines 14-57; figures 3A, 3B, 4 *; | [A]DE102007001609 (SPENGLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 12 * paragraphs [0013] - [0024] - [0 26] , [0 27]; figure - * | by applicant | US4025655 | US4040342 | US4636337 | US6712342 | US5182084 | WO2008124851 | US6142063 | US6606938 | US6644173 | US7165488 | US5840189 |