EP2755004 - Distributed sensor for measuring corrosion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensortran, Inc. 4401 Friedrich Lane, Suite 307 Austin TX 78744 / US | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Chung, E 9204 Garden Ranch Court TX 78749 Austin, TX 78749 / US | 02 /
Kalar, Kent 34 Lovegrass Lane Austin, TX 78745 / US | 03 /
Sanders, Michael, E 3213 Smoky Ridge Austin, TX 78730 / US | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14163920.3 | 13.03.2007 | [2014/29] | Priority number, date | US20060781833P | 13.03.2006 Original published format: US 781833 P | US20060787617P | 30.03.2006 Original published format: US 787617 P | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2755004 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Classification | IPC: | G01K11/32, G01N21/77 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
G01K11/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/29] | Title | German: | Verteilter Sensor zur Messung von Korrosion | [2014/30] | English: | Distributed sensor for measuring corrosion | [2014/30] | French: | Capteur réparti pour la mesure de la corrosion | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 24.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07758465.4 / EP1996911 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5113277 | US7057714 |