EP2798986 - Collector of spent coffee grounds for a coffee machine and coffee machine incorporating such a collector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De'Longhi Appliances S.r.l. Via L. Seitz 47 31100 Treviso / IT | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De' Longhi, Giuseppe Vicolo Rovero, 1 31100 TREVISO / IT | 02 /
Altoe', Edy Via A. De Gasperi, 1 31025 S. LUCIA DI PIAVE (TREVISO) / IT | 03 /
Sartor, Alessandro Vicolo Ungaretti, 6 31030 VACIL DI BREDA DI PIAVE (TREVISO) / IT | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Rapisardi, Mariacristina Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l. Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | [2014/45] | Application number, filing date | 14163986.4 | 09.04.2014 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | IT2013MI00724 | 03.05.2013 Original published format: IT MI20130724 | [2014/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798986 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2798986 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
A47J31/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2014/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sammler von Kaffeesatz für eine Kaffeemaschine sowie Kaffeemaschine mit einem solchen Sammler | [2014/45] | English: | Collector of spent coffee grounds for a coffee machine and coffee machine incorporating such a collector | [2014/45] | French: | Collecteur de marc de café usagé pour machine à café et machine à café incorporant un tel collecteur | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 17.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2014 | AL | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | IE | 09.04.2016 | LU | 09.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | BE | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012182825 (RIME PHILIPPE [CH]) [A] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] - [0 54] , [0 56] - [0059]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2010251900 (CAHEN ANTOINE [CH], et al) [A] 1,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 52] , [0 55] , [0 56] , [0 62] - [0066]; figures 1, 2, 6 *; | [A]US2013081739 (CAHEN ANTOINE [CH], et al) [A] 14,15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 41] , [0 61] , [0 62] , [0 65] , [0 66]; figure - * |