EP2789955 - Refrigerator and mobile terminal for food management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Se Il 401-1305, Kkachi Maeul Lotte Apt., Gumi-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
JO, Su Ho 904-1404, Cheongsol Maeul Jugong 9 Danji Apt. Geumgok-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
CHA, Jae Hoon 826-1406, Woosung Apt., Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
HAN, Na Jeong 102, 983-3, Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
MYOUNG, Kwan Joo 103-2102, Dongsuwon LG Village 1 Cha, Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14164049.0 | 09.04.2014 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | KR20130038753 | 09.04.2013 Original published format: KR 20130038753 | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2789955 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2789955 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
F25D23/00 (KR);
F25D29/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25D2400/361 (EP,US);
F25D2500/06 (EP,US);
F25D2700/06 (EP,US);
F25D2700/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2014/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kühlschrank und mobiles Endgerät zur Handhabung von Lebensmitteln | [2014/42] | English: | Refrigerator and mobile terminal for food management | [2014/42] | French: | Réfrigérateur et terminal mobile pour gestion des aliments | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6204763 (SONE MASAHIRO [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 18; figure - *; | [A]GB2354620 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* claim 3 *; | [I]US2003023493 (OHASHI SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0035] , [0037]; figure 6; claim - *; | [A]US2007152048 (JUNG HEE W [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007236357 (GLIELMO LUIGI [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012217254 (CHO A RA [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2012265348 (KIM MUSEUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] - [0030] - [0033] - [0049]; figure 2 * |