EP2930469 - Method for providing predictive destinations and/or predictive routing for reaching a destination and navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartsch, Patrick Dr. Osterhop 54 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
Wilkens, Kathrin Dr. Prinzengarten 8 23229 Celle / DE | 03 /
Gerlach, Simon Dr. Bütersworthstrasse 6 30161 Hannover / DE | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Zucker, Volker Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14164053.2 | 09.04.2014 | [2015/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2930469 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
G01C21/3617 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/34 (US);
G01C21/3415 (EP,US);
G01C21/3492 (US);
G01C21/36 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung prädiktiver Zielpositionen und/oder prädiktiver Routen zur Erreichung einer Zielposition und Navigationssystem | [2015/42] | English: | Method for providing predictive destinations and/or predictive routing for reaching a destination and navigation system | [2015/42] | French: | Procédé de prédiction de destinations et/ou de routes pour atteindre une destination et système de navigation | [2015/42] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | 07.08.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.04.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | Appeal following examination | 05.10.2018 | Appeal received No. T2969/18 | 15.11.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.04.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0146781 (ETAK INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * page 8, lines 1-6 * * page 12, line 17 * * page 12, lines 26-28 * * page 13, lines 3-5 * * page 13, line 12 * * page 14, line 9 * * page 15, lines 8-11 * * page 15, lines 19-21 * * page 16, lines 1-4 * * page 16, lines 13-14 * * page 18, lines 16-20 * * page 18, lines 26-28 * * page 19, line 1 * * page 26, lines 25-28 * * page 27, lines 1-5 * * figure 4 *[I] 5 | by applicant | DE19535576 | WO2007087928 |