Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9746999 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2017 | B2 | US2015234554 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514668111 | 25.03.2015 | US201313860693 | 11.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9020568 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2015 | B2 | US2014308992 | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313860693 | 11.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2790393 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2018 | B1 | EP2790393 | 15.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313860693 | 11.04.2013 |