|
07.08.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.08.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
13.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.04.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2014 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |