09.08.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
31.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
25.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
30.03.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
15.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
14.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
14.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.05.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
06.05.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
22.04.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.03.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
20.03.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
01.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
15.08.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
15.08.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
08.08.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
22.07.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
27.06.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
27.06.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
20.06.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
12.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|