Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022125030 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80046210 | 14.05.2010 | US201514594613 | 12.01.2015 | US201414153723 | 13.01.2014 | US96862010 | 15.12.2010 | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US201916294396 | 06.03.2019 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US202217572091 | 10.01.2022 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | US201213723760 | 21.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8984804 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2015 | B2 | US2014123542 | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80046210 | 14.05.2010 | US201414153723 | 13.01.2014 | US96862010 | 15.12.2010 | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | US201213723760 | 21.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8661728 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2014 | B2 | US2014013652 | 16.01.2014 | A9 | US2013125450 | 23.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80046210 | 14.05.2010 | US96862010 | 15.12.2010 | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | US201213723760 | 21.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8375626 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2013 | B2 | US2011080255 | 07.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80046210 | 14.05.2010 | US96862010 | 15.12.2010 | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7905048 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2010223837 | 09.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80046210 | 14.05.2010 | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7743552 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2010 | B2 | US2008148624 | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11234430 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2022 | B2 | US2019200597 | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80046210 | 14.05.2010 | US201514594613 | 12.01.2015 | US201414153723 | 13.01.2014 | US96862010 | 15.12.2010 | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US201916294396 | 06.03.2019 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | US201213723760 | 21.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10264776 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2019 | B2 | US2015121745 | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80046210 | 14.05.2010 | US201514594613 | 12.01.2015 | US201414153723 | 13.01.2014 | US96862010 | 15.12.2010 | US97591407 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | US201213723760 | 21.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5066575B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2012 | B2 | JP2010507390 | 11.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US22386 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2076118 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2010 | A4 | EP2076118 | 08.07.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US22386 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007309475B | Global Dossier | 08.11.2012 | B2 | AU2007309475 | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US22386 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2756755 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP2756755 | 17.09.2014 | A3 | EP2756755 | 23.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US22386 | 22.10.2007 | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | EP07852871 | 22.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008051501 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2008 | A3 | WO2008051501 | 02.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2702357T | 28.02.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US85357306 | 23.10.2006 | US85437806 | 25.10.2006 | Type | Earlier application | EP2076118 |