EP2808157 - Wind turbine blade and method of fabricating a wind turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Obrecht, John M. 534 Hoptree Court Louisville, 80027 / US | [2014/49] | Application number, filing date | 14164591.1 | 14.04.2014 | [2014/49] | Priority number, date | US201313904414 | 29.05.2013 Original published format: US201313904414 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808157 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/34, B29D99/00, F03D1/06, // B29L31/08 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
B29C65/4805 (BR);
B29C70/40 (CN);
B21D53/78 (US);
B23P15/02 (US);
B23P15/04 (US);
B29C65/5092 (BR);
B29C70/304 (EP);
B29C70/342 (EP,US);
B29D99/0028 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (US);
F03D80/00 (CN);
B29L2031/085 (EP,US);
F05B2240/302 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2014/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Windturbinenschaufel und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Windturbinenschaufel | [2014/49] | English: | Wind turbine blade and method of fabricating a wind turbine blade | [2014/49] | French: | Pale de turbine éolienne et procédé de fabrication d'une telle pale | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2033769 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11,13,15,16,20 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 8 [I] 14,17-19; | [XYI]US2006083907 (BECH ANTON [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10-13,15-18,20 * paragraphs [0010] , [0019] , [0020] , [0021] , [0023] , [0030] , [0035] , [0069] - [0075] - [0077] , [0111] , [0113] , [0117] - [0124] - [0130]; figure -; claims 32,39,42 * [Y] 8 [I] 14,19; | [X]EP0865900 (ALTERNATIVES EN [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-3 * |