EP2933824 - Substrate arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lander, Robert James Pascoe Intellectual Property and Licensing NXP Semiconductors Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2021/33] |
Former [2015/43] | Crawford, Andrew NXP SEMICONDUCTORS UK LTD Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 14164634.9 | 14.04.2014 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933824 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933824 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, H01L21/20, H01L21/762, H01L29/267, H01L29/20 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H01L29/267 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02433 (EP,US);
H01L21/0245 (EP,US);
H01L21/02488 (US);
H01L21/02516 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02609 (EP,US);
H01L21/02658 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | H01L21/02, // H01L21/762 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2015/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Substratanordnung | [2015/43] | English: | Substrate arrangement | [2015/43] | French: | Arrangement d'un substrat | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2014 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | IT | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | IE | 14.04.2022 | LU | 14.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.04.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.04.2022 | ||
LU | 14.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.04.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.04.2022 | ||
LU | 14.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.04.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.04.2022 | ||
LU | 14.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 14.04.2022 | ||
LU | 14.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
LU | 14.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009173967 (HAMAGUCHI MASAFUMI [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,14,15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0043] * * figure 2 * [I] 9,10,13; | [XI]US2007004222 (WEI QINGQIAO [US]) [X] 1-7,11,14 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 9,10,13,15; | [XI]US2010327395 (HAMAGUCHI MASAFUMI [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,13-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * figure 1 * [I] 9,10; | [XI]US2004217352 (FORBES LEONARD [US]) [X] 1-7,11,14 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 4, 5 * [I] 9,10,13,15 | [XI] - FUJIKAWA Y ET AL, "Silicon on insulator for symmetry-converted growth", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (20070612), vol. 90, no. 24, doi:10.1063/1.2748099, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 243107 - 243107, XP012095299 [X] 1-8,11,12,14 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2748099 | [XI] - MIN YANG ET AL, "Hybrid-orientation technology (HOT): opportunities and challenges", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (200605), vol. 53, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TED.2006.872693, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 965 - 978, XP009095610 [X] 1-8,11,14,15 * pages 967-968, chapter 'V. HOT substrate preparation' * * pages 968-969, chapter 'VI. HOT CMOS device fabrication' * * figure 6 * [I] 9,10,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TED.2006.872693 | [XI] - BUTTARD D ET AL, "Grazing incidence X-ray studies of twist-bonded Si/Si and Si/SiO2 interfaces", PHYSICA B. CONDENSED MATTER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200006), vol. 283, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0921-4526(99)01900-6, ISSN 0921-4526, pages 103 - 107, XP009074050 [X] 1-7,11,14 * pages 104-106, chapter '2.1 Hydrophobic bonding Si/Si' * [I] 9,10,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-4526(99)01900-6 | Examination | DE102008009411 | - BOURRET A ED - YU JIAGUO ET AL, "Compliant substrates: a review on the concept, techniques and mechanisms", APPLIED SURFACE SCI, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000901), vol. 164, doi:10.1016/S0169-4332(00)00326-3, ISSN 0169-4332, pages 3 - 14, XP009074047 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-4332(00)00326-3 | - MUHAMMAD JAMIL, "Development of large area dislocation defect reduced III-nitride layers on silicon (111) substrate", (20060101), pages 1 - 175, DISSERTATION, STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK AT ALBANY, US, URL: https://search.proquest.com/docview/304950417?pq-origsite=gscholar, (201908), XP009515256 | - TINGKAI LI ET AL, Chapter 2: Challenge of III-V Materials Integration with Si Microtelectronics, CRC press, (20110101), pages 51 - 96, XP009189029 |