Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP2796457

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
 LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure24.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted18.05.2016
Opposition procedure21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.04.2017 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.10.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:29.10.2014 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2504332
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.10.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:29.10.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140416
 
Event date:29.07.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/4025 20060101ALI20150625BHEP
 
Event date:29.07.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20150625BHEP
 
Event date:29.07.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07D 405/06 20060101AFI20150625BHEP
 
Event date:19.08.2015 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20150720
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1203485 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:20.01.2016 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20160105
 
Event date:18.05.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:18.05.2016 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2504332
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:18.05.2016 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:18.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:15.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 800352 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20160615
 
Event date:07.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602010033559 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:06.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:29.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20160823
 
Event date:17.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E012337 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20160811
 
Event date:19.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2586947 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20161019
 
Event date:14.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:7
 
Event date:24.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION]
Effective DATE:20160518
 
Event date:02.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20160401987 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20161118
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E029371 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:11.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:26.04.2017 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20170221
 
Event date:21.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602010033559 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:21.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1203485 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:14.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 2796457 PT 20160714 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20160707
 
Event date:12.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:11.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:15.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT UEP 800352 AT T
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
Effective DATE:20160518
 
Event date:29.11.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Payment DATE:20190926
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:21.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20161038 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:17.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20161038 HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:04.10.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20161038 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20190927
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20191028
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20191008
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Payment DATE:20191029
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:28.02.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20191129
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.03.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20191119
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:01.05.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Payment DATE:20191121
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:29.05.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20191122
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:27.11.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20161038 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20201029
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.03.2016 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:15.04.2016 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:19.07.2015 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:30.06.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201130
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210607
 
Event date:30.07.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201124
 
Event date:28.10.2014 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:24.03.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201124
 
Event date:24.12.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20161038 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20211122
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:24.03.2017 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:30.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201124
 
Event date:23.12.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20161038 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20221123
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:14.06.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230424
 
Event date:30.11.2023 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20201124
 
Event date:08.12.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20161038 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20231004
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:08.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20240913
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:10.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20240910
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20240916
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:15.11.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20241004
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:12.12.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20241122
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:06.12.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20161038 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20240927
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:16.12.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20241113
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:08.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20241024
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:09.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20241024
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:10.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:14.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20241111
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:15.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20241118
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20241014
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20241121
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20241007
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:17.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:21.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20241003
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:23.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20241025
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:23.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:24.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20241017
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:24.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20241030
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:27.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20241014
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:27.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20241028
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Payment DATE:20241106
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20241010
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20241209
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:29.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20241001
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20241201
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:03.02.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20241113
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:25.02.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20240925
Year of Fee Payment:15