EP2933900 - Stator and/or rotor of a dynamo-electric machine, in particular for natural gas compressors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaussner, Bernhard Grolandstrasse 21 90408 Nürnberg / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 14164908.7 | 16.04.2014 | [2015/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933900 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/02, H01F1/26, H01F1/28, H02K15/02 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
H02K1/02 (EP);
H01F1/26 (EP);
H01F1/37 (EP);
H02K15/02 (EP);
H02K1/2766 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stator und/oder Rotor einer dynamoelektrischen Maschine insbesondere für Erdgaskompressoren | [2015/43] | English: | Stator and/or rotor of a dynamo-electric machine, in particular for natural gas compressors | [2015/43] | French: | Stator et/ou rotor d'une machine dynamoélectrique en particulier pour des compresseurs à gaz naturel | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5069972 (VERSIC RONALD J [US]) [X] 2,5,11,12 * column 1, lines 1-43; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 35-40 * * column 3, lines 1-4,17-29,53-54 * * column 4, lines 25-28 * * column 6, lines 20-24,63-65 * * column 7, lines 5-14 * [Y] 2-4,6,8,9 [I] 7; | [XYI]US2013162064 (KIM CHANGSUNG SEAN [KR], et al) [X] 2,3,5,12 * paragraphs [0009] , [0032] , [0034] , [0035] , [0038] , [0039] , [0042]; figures 1A, 1B * [Y] 2-4,8,9,13 [I] 2,6,7,11; | [XYI]JP2010077405 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP) [X] 2,3,5,6,11,12 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0032] , [0033] , [0043]; figure 13 * [Y] 4,6,8,9,13 [I] 7; | [Y]US2007110596 (WEEBER KONRAD R [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [1316] , [0021]; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP0552378 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,13 * column 2, lines 37-39; figure 2 * * column 3, lines 3-8 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 4 * * column 6, lines 4-7 * |