EP2804074 - Power Efficient Image Sensing Apparatus, Method of Operating the Same and Eye/Gaze Tracking System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tobii AB Box 743 182 17 Danderyd / SE | [2016/07] |
Former [2014/47] | For all designated states Tobii Technology AB Karlsrovägen 2 D 182 53 Danderyd / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skogö, Mårten Danarövägen 50 182 56 Danderyd / SE | 02 /
Jönsson, Henrik Helgalunden 3, 3 tr 118 58 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
Karlsson, Mattias O. Norrtullsgatan 51 113 45 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
Kuldkepp, Mattias Pilvägen 8B 191 40 Sollentuna / SE | 05 /
Elvesjö, John S:t Göransgatan 83 112 45 Stockholm / SE | 06 /
Karlsson, Ingemar Mattias Olsborgsvägen 22 186 41 Vallentuna / SE | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Wihlsson, Joakim Per Magnus Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366 102 49 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 14165083.8 | 17.04.2014 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | GB20130007724 | 29.04.2013 Original published format: GB 201307724 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2804074 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2804074 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32, H04N5/232 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G06F1/325 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/013 (KR,US);
H04N25/42 (GB);
G06F3/0304 (KR,US);
H04N13/383 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,GB,US);
H04N23/65 (KR);
H04N23/651 (EP,GB,US);
H04N23/667 (KR,US);
H04N23/67 (KR);
H04N25/00 (EP);
H04N25/745 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/47] | G06F1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2014/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leistungseffiziente Bildaufnahmevorrichtung, Betriebsverfahren dafür und Augen-/Blickverfolgungssystem | [2014/47] | English: | Power Efficient Image Sensing Apparatus, Method of Operating the Same and Eye/Gaze Tracking System | [2014/47] | French: | Appareil de détection d'image à faible consommation d'énergie, son procédé de fonctionnement et système de suivi du regard/de l'oeil | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 06.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP19184761.5 / EP3570138 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1168833 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP1246457 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [X]US2010253803 (ISE MAKOTO [JP]) | by applicant | US6526159 | US2008111833 | US7379560 | US2010079508 |