EP2933289 - Polymer composition from mixed plastic waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolan Investment OÜ Narva mnt 5 PK 800 10117 Tallinn / EE | [2016/24] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Rexest Grupp OÜ Mäo Center 72751 Järva County / EE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valdmaa, Andrus Mõisniku 49 Ülenurme Parish 61714 Tartu County / EE | 02 /
Käsnar, Aivo C.R.Jakobsoni 14-3 51005 Tartu / EE | 03 /
Saareväli, Aarne Kastevarre 17 11912 Tallinn / EE | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Sarap, Margus Jalaka 42-23 50109 Tartu / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Sarap, Margus Sarap & Partners Patent Agency Kompanii 1C 51004 Tartu / EE | Application number, filing date | 14165118.2 | 17.04.2014 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933289 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/06, B29B17/00, // C08L23/06, C08L23/10 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
C08J11/06 (EP,US);
B29B17/0042 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (US);
C08J2300/30 (US);
C08J2323/06 (EP,US);
C08J2323/12 (US);
C08J2423/10 (EP,US);
C08J2425/04 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (US);
C08L2205/03 (US);
C08L2205/035 (US);
C08L2207/20 (US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2015/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polymerzusammensetzung aus gemischtem Kunststoffabfall | [2015/43] | English: | Polymer composition from mixed plastic waste | [2015/43] | French: | Composition polymère à partir de déchets de plastique mélangés | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0211963 (MATERIAL SCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 1,10,11 * claims 1, 2, 13-15 * * page 17, line 18 - page 18, line 29 * [I] 1-11; | [X]US5075057 (HOEDL HERBERT K [CA]) [X] 10,11 * claim 1 * * column 3, line 52 - line 65 *; | [X]DE3715646 (HEINLEIN HANS [DE]) [X] 10 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2009029074 (SASINE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO03087215 (MBA POLYMERS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1, 60, 61 *; | [A]EP2017050 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * examples 2,3; table 1 * | by applicant | WO2012009005 | WO0238276 | US6274637 |