EP2933255 - Novel crystalline form of 1-(beta-D-glucopyranosyl)-4- methyl-3-[5-(4-fluorophenyl)-2-thienylmethyl]benzene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Kluschanzoff, Harald Sandoz International GmbH Global Intellectual Property Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 14165135.6 | 17.04.2014 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933255 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/10 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
C07D409/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neue Krystallform von 1-(beta-D-glucopyranosyl)-4- methyl-3-[5-(4-fluorophenyl)-2-thienylmethyl]benzene | [2015/43] | English: | Novel crystalline form of 1-(beta-D-glucopyranosyl)-4- methyl-3-[5-(4-fluorophenyl)-2-thienylmethyl]benzene | [2015/43] | French: | Nouvelle forme cristalline de 1-(beta-D-glucopyranosyl)-4- methyl-3-[5-(4-fluorophenyl)-2-thienylmethyl]benzene | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2016/17] | 03.12.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2008069327 (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP [JP], et al) [YD] 1-14 * Claims, Figures 1-2, examples 1-2 *; | [YD]WO2009035969 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [YD] 1-14 * Claims, in particular claims 22, 37-38; Page 64, Figure 1 and examples *; | [YD]WO2012140120 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [YD] 1-14 * Claims, in particular claim 11; Examples 11-12 and page 70. *; | [YD]CN103554092 (CRYSTAL PHARMATECH CO LTD) [YD] 1-14 * Whole document, in particular Figure 1 *; | [YD]CN103588762 (CRYSTAL PHARMATECH CO LTD) [YD] 1-14 * Whole document, in particular Figures 1 and 3 *; | [YD]CN103641822 (JIANGSU AOSAIKANG PHARM CO LTD) [YD] 1-14 * Whole document, in particular Figure 1, table on page 4 and paragraph [18] *; | [Y] - CAIRA M R, "CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPHISM OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19980101), vol. 198, doi:10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 163 - 208, XP001156954 [Y] 1-14 * Pages 165-166 and chapter 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | by applicant | WO2005012326 | WO2008069327 | WO2009035969 | WO2010043682 | WO2011047113 | WO2012140120 | WO2011003976 | WO2012154812 | WO2013064909 | CN103554092 | CN103588762 | CN103641822 |