EP2797032 - Method and system using two parallel optical character recognition processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [2018/02] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | ||
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Technologies Humanware Inc 1800, rue Jean-Berchmans Michaud Drummondville, Quebec J2C 7G7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamel, Pierre 7, cours du Fleuve Verdun, Québec H3E 1X1 / CA | 02 /
Belanger, Alain 2757, rue Lincourt Longueuil, Québec J4M 2H4 / CA | 03 /
Beauchamp, Eric 45, rue de l'Argile La Prairie, Québec J5R 0E3 / CA | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14165179.4 | 17.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | US201361814479P | 22.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361814479 P | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2797032 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2797032 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/22, G06K9/32, G09B21/00 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
G09B21/007 (EP,US);
G06V10/96 (EP,US);
G06V30/147 (EP,US);
G06V30/153 (US);
G06V30/40 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | G06K9/00, G06K9/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System mit zwei parallelen optischen Zeichenerkennungsprozessen | [2014/44] | English: | Method and system using two parallel optical character recognition processes | [2014/44] | French: | Procédé et système utilisant deux processus de reconnaissance de caractères optiques parallèles | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2020 | 26.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/16] | 14.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005162512 (SEAKINS PAUL J [NZ]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] , [0 69] , [0 70] , [0 72] , [0 74] , [0 76] - [0078] * * figure 8 *; | [A]US2005288932 (KURZWEIL RAYMOND C [US], et al) [A] 2-5,12,13 * paragraphs [0102] , [ 171] - [0172] - [ 178] , [ 192] *; | [A]US8244038 (FAN ZHIGANG [US], et al) [A] 6,14* column 1, lines 13-39 *; | [XI] - CHRISTOPH LAMPERT ET AL., "Oblivious document capture and real-time retrieval", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON CAMERA-BASED DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, (20050101), XP055071002 [X] 1,7-9,11,15 * abstract * * section 1 * * sections 3.1-3.4 * * section 5, last paragraph * * figure 4 * [I] 2-6,10,12-14 |