EP2796380 - Label separating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-13-5, Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endou, Yasuyuki c/o Toppan Forms Co., Ltd. 7-3, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8311 / JP | 02 /
Tamura, Masaki c/o Toppan Forms Co., Ltd. 7-3, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8311 / JP | 03 /
Naka, Masahiro c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-13-5, Tsudanuma Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0016 / JP | 04 /
Yamagata, Toshiyuki c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-13-5, Tsudanuma Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0016 / JP | 05 /
Shibata, Hiroyuki c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-13-5, Tsudanuma Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0016 / JP | [2015/48] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
Endou, Yasuyuki c/o Toppan Forms Co., Ltd. 7-3, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8311 / JP | ||
02 /
Tamura, Masaki c/o Toppan Forms Co., Ltd. 7-3, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8311 / JP | |||
03 /
Naka, Masahiro c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-13-5, Tsudanuma Chiba 275-0016 Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0016 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamagata, Toshiyuki c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-13-5, Tsudanuma Chiba 275-0016 Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0016 / JP | |||
05 /
Shibata, Hiroyuki c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-13-5, Tsudanuma Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0016 / JP | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 14165567.0 | 23.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | JP20130093396 | 26.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013093396 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796380 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2796380 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/18, B65C9/40 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B65C9/1865 (EP,US);
B07C5/368 (US);
B65C9/40 (EP,US);
B65C2009/404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Etiketttrennvorrichtung | [2014/44] | English: | Label separating apparatus | [2014/44] | French: | Appareil de séparation d'étiquette | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 16.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2014 | AL | 09.12.2015 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | IE | 23.04.2016 | LU | 23.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 23.04.2016 | ||
LU | 23.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 23.04.2016 | ||
LU | 23.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 23.04.2016 | ||
LU | 23.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 23.04.2016 | ||
LU | 23.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 23.04.2016 | ||
LU | 23.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
LU | 23.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]USRE30419E (LABEL-AIRE INC) [A] 1 * column 5, line 12 - line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1787913 (ATLANTIC ZEISERGMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO2011051396 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 27, line 12 - page 28, line 19; figures 12,13 * | by applicant | JP2011148556 | JP2011195151 |