EP2796914 - Zoom lens and image pickup device including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2019/33] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAHARA, Makoto c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2019/33] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
Nakahara, Makoto c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 14165818.7 | 24.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | JP20130092174 | 25.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013092174 | JP20140081262 | 10.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014081262 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2796914 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2796914 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2796914 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/177, G02B15/22 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
G02B15/177 (EP,US);
G02B15/144503 (EP,US);
G02B15/144507 (EP,US);
G02B15/144511 (EP,US);
G02B15/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zoomobjektiv und Bildaufnahmevorrichtung damit | [2014/44] | English: | Zoom lens and image pickup device including the same | [2014/44] | French: | Objectif à focale variable et dispositif de capture d'image comprenant celui-ci | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2014 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | IT | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | IE | 24.04.2020 | LU | 24.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2013050674 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP) [X] 1,2,5,9,13 * Paragraphs [0066]-[0069], [0090];; figures 21,22; example 6 * * claims 1,6,7 * [I] 3,4,6,7,10; | [XI]JP2003215451 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1,6-8,13 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085]; figure 1; claim 1; tables 1,2,3 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2006268426 (ARIMOTO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,13 * paragraph [0048]; figure 1; claim 1; table 1 * [I] 3-6; | [ID]JP2001343584 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [ID] 1-8,13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010]; figure 1; example 1; claim 1; tables 2,3 *; | [XP]EP2693251 (CANON KK [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5-9,13 * Paragraphs [0052]-[0056], [0085];; figure 1; example 1 * * Paragraphs [0073]-[0077], [0090];; figure 11; example 6 * * Paragraphs [0005]-[0008], [0026];; claims 1,2,4,5,6,7,8 *; | [XI]JP2012027262 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP) [X] 1,2,6,8 * paragraphs [0081],[0120],[0127];; figure 2; example 1 * [I] 3,4,7,11,12; | [A]US2009290227 (IZUHARA ISAMU [JP], et al) [A] 11,12 * Expressions (4),(5); paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0078]; figure 1; example 1; tables 1,2 *; | [A]US2007139787 (KIM DONG-WOO [KR]) [A] 11,12 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052]; figure 2; example 1 * | Examination | JP3363571B | by applicant | JP2006058584 | US7777967 | JP2001343584 | JPH07306362 |