EP2796080 - Dishwasher and sensing module for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/24] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyoung Jun 307-302, Ramian-Everheim Apt., Naeson-2-Dong Uiwang-Si Kyungki-Do / KR | 02 /
Ryu, Ji Suk 101-307, Hyundai-Beach Apt., Yongho-1-Dong, Nam-Gu Pusan-Si / KR | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/24] |
Former [2014/44] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14165840.1 | 24.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | KR20130046132 | 25.04.2013 Original published format: KR 20130046132 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2796080 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2796080 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2796080 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A47L15/4212 (EP,US);
A47L15/46 (KR);
A47L15/4297 (US);
A47L15/00 (KR);
A47L15/42 (KR);
A47L15/4214 (US);
A47L15/4244 (EP,US);
A47L15/4274 (EP,US);
A47L15/4287 (EP,US);
G01K1/14 (KR);
A47L2401/09 (US);
A47L2401/10 (US);
A47L2401/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Geschirrspülmaschine und Messmodul dafür | [2014/44] | English: | Dishwasher and sensing module for the same | [2014/44] | French: | Lave-vaisselle et module de détection pour celui-ci | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 30.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2014 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | MT | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | TR | 16.06.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
TR | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5446531 (BOYER JEFFREY E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 8-12 [I] 2,5,13,14; | [A]EP1335060 (ZANGENSTEIN ELEKTRO [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP1358833 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP1677085 (MOONHAVEN LLC [US]) [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-14; | [XYI]US2006237036 (PICARDAT JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3,8-12 [I] 6,7,13,14; | [A]EP2233058 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |