EP2940773 - Ejector for solid oxide electrolysis cell stack system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOBSSON, Niklas Bengt Hästskovägen 1 26023 Kågeröd / SE | 02 /
FRIIS PEDERSEN, Claus Grøndals Parkvej 94 DK-2720 Vanløse / DK | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 14166323.7 | 29.04.2014 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2940773 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/06, H01M8/04, // H01M8/12 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
C25B1/00 (EP);
C25B9/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Auswerfer für Festoxid-Elektrolysezellenstapelsystem | [2015/45] | English: | Ejector for solid oxide electrolysis cell stack system | [2015/45] | French: | Éjecteur pour système d'empilement de cellule d'électrolyse d'oxyde solide | [2015/45] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2007128786 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO2009059571 (VOLLMAR HORST-ECKART [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 30 - page 6, line 3; figures 2,4 *; | [A]WO2013131778 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007045125 | US2008023338 | US8138380 | US2012228150 | US8366902 | - "Electrolysis of Carbon Dioxide in Solid Oxide Electrolysis Cells", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (2009), vol. 193, pages 349 - 358 |