EP2816558 - SPEECH PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/52] | Speech processing device and method | ||
[2019/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Togawa, Taro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Shioda, Chisato c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Otani, Takeshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/52] | Application number, filing date | 14166346.8 | 29.04.2014 | [2014/52] | Priority number, date | JP20130126303 | 17.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013126303 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816558 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816558 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/057, G10L15/04, G10L15/02, G10L21/02, // G10L15/08 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G10L21/057 (EP,US);
G10L13/027 (US);
G10L15/02 (EP,US);
G10L15/04 (EP,US);
G10L15/08 (US);
G10L21/02 (EP,US);
G10L21/0364 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | G10L21/057, G10L15/04, G10L15/02, G10L21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2014/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPRACHVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/13] | English: | SPEECH PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2019/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PAROLE | [2019/13] |
Former [2014/52] | Sprachverarbeitungsvorrichtung und -verfahren | ||
Former [2014/52] | Speech processing device and method | ||
Former [2014/52] | Dispositif et procédé de traitement de la parole | Examination procedure | 11.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 23.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2014 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.04.2014 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7065485 (CHONG-WHITE NICOLA R [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]US2012203553 (MARUTA YUZO [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract ** paragraph [0006] *; | [XAI] - DANIEL FELPS ET AL, "Foreign Accent Conversion Through Concatenative Synthesis in the Articulatory Domain", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUDIO, SPEECH AND LANGUAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20121001), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TASL.2012.2201474, ISSN 1558-7916, pages 2301 - 2312, XP011456070 [X] 1,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [00II] , [ IVA] * [A] 5,8 [I] 2-4,6,7,9,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASL.2012.2201474 | [A] - FELPS D ET AL, "Foreign accent conversion in computer assisted pronunciation training", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 51, no. 10, ISSN 0167-6393, (20091001), pages 920 - 932, (20081130), XP026448174 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 4.1] , [ 4.1.1.] * | [A] - QIN YAN ET AL, "Analysis by synthesis of acoustic correlates of British, Australian and american accents", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP ' 04). IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA 17-21 MAY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040517), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-8484-2, pages 637 - 640, XP010717709 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [I.A.3] * * paragraph [I.A.4] * * paragraph [0V.A] * * paragraph [00VI] * | [A] - Keiichi Tajima ET AL, "Ef fects of temporal correction on intelligibility of foreign-accented English 1", Journal of Phonetics, (19970101), pages 1 - 24, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0095447096900315/pdf?md5=a13bab6f37ae98ec26df73a6d5bac5e7&pid=1-s2.0-S0095447096900315-main.pdf, (20141105), XP055151147 [A] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [2.1.3] * | Examination | US2003157468 | by applicant | JPS6254297 | JPS63155200 | JPH04255900 | JP2009258366 | WO2009145192 | JP4942860B | JP5160594B |