EP2808881 - Switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Japan Co., Ltd. 39, Aza-Higashihara Sendai Kumagaya-shi Saitama 360-0193 / JP | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Hiroyuki Valeo Japan Co., Ltd. 5-28-6, Omorinishi, Ota-ku Tokyo, 143-8521 / JP | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann LLP Washingtonstrasse 75 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 14166737.8 | 30.04.2014 | [2014/49] | Priority number, date | JP20130116504 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013116504 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808881 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2808881 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/06, F16H59/10, H01H19/58 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
F16H59/105 (EP,US);
H01H3/16 (US);
H01H1/06 (EP,US);
H01H19/585 (EP,US);
H01H2300/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2014/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schalter | [2014/49] | English: | Switch | [2014/49] | French: | Commutateur | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2014 | AL | 13.04.2016 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | IE | 30.04.2016 | LU | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 30.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06223672 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0661481 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 15; figure - *; | [A]JP2007012558 (SONY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [I]JP2009301801 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [I] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2010224468 (MATSUHASHI HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0066]; figure - * | by applicant | JP2012074310 |