EP2767298 - Therapeutic methods and compositions for solid delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Presage Biosciences, Inc. 530 Fairview Avenue North Suite 1000 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klinghoffer, Richard 7307 56th Avenue Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 02 /
Frazier, Jason 10027 62nd Avenue S Seattle, WA 98178 / US | 03 /
Grenley, Marc 1610 Belmont Ave Apt 415 Seattle, WA 98122 / US | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/36] | 01 /
Klinghoffer, Richard 7307 56th Avenue Seattle, WA 98115 / US | ||
02 /
Frazier, Jason 10027 62nd Avenue S Seattle, WA 98178 / US | |||
03 /
Grenley, Marc 6044 35th Avenue Ne Seattle, WA / US | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14166779.0 | 23.11.2011 | [2014/34] | Priority number, date | US20100416686P | 23.11.2010 Original published format: US 416686 P | US20100417157P | 24.11.2010 Original published format: US 417157 P | US201161454115P | 18.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161454115 P | US201161475594P | 14.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161475594 P | US201161475858P | 15.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161475858 P | US201161483437P | 06.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161483437 P | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2767298 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2767298 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/32 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
A61M5/1408 (EP,US);
A61K49/0004 (US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
A61M37/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61M5/14212 (EP,US);
A61M5/3298 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | A61M5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | Therapeutische Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Abgabe in fester Form | [2014/34] | English: | Therapeutic methods and compositions for solid delivery | [2014/34] | French: | Procédés thérapeutiques et compositions pour administration solide | [2014/34] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 07.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 30.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11843742.5 / EP2643045 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0774464 (COMBICHEM INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 15, line 56 - page 16, line 4 *; | [A]US2003162715 (DUAN D ROXANNE [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]WO2009023798 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * figure 7; claim 74 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 25 * | by applicant | US4014335 | US4164559 | US4897268 | US4988617 | US5030002 | US5041538 | US5075109 | US5137809 | US5139941 | US5173414 | US5242794 | WO9513365 | WO9513392 | US5494810 | WO9617947 | US5599672 | WO9706243 | WO9708298 | WO9709441 | US5627037 | EP0774464 | WO9721825 | US5658776 | WO9809657 | US5751629 | US5786211 | US5789172 | US5798035 | US5858351 | US5871982 | WO9911764 | US5935788 | US5942420 | US6258595 | US6410232 | US2003022207 | US2003044781 | US6537966 | US6566118 | US6582938 | US2005100932 | US6953662 | US2006024711 | US2006024678 | US2007254041 | - TUNGGAL ET AL., CLIN. CANC. RES, (1999), vol. 5, page 1583 | - IGNATIADIS ET AL., PATHOBIOL, (2008), vol. 75, page 104 | - CURR. DRUG DISCOV. TECHNOL., vol. 5, page 9 | - AUMAN ET AL., DRUG METAB. REV., (2008), vol. 40, page 303 | - TALMADGE ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2007), vol. 170, page 793 | - KERBEL, CANC. BIOL. THERAP., (2003), vol. 2, no. 4, page 134 | - MAN ET AL., CANC. MET. REV., (2007), vol. 26, page 737 | - CESPEDES ET AL., CLIN. TRANSL ONCOL., (2006), vol. 8, page 318 | - VEISEH ET AL., CANC. RES., (2007), vol. 67, page 6882 | - ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOPHYSICS AND BIOENGINEERING, (1974), vol. 3, pages 231 - 253 | - M.A. HAYAT, Cancer Iniaging, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2007), vol. 1, 2 | - CHAN ET AL., "DNA Mapping Using Micr ofluidic Stretching and Single-Molecule Detection of Fluorescent Site-Specific Tags", GENOME RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 14, pages 1137 - 1146 | - MARGUILES ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 437, no. 7057, pages 376 - 80 | - HONG, S ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 435 - 9 | - BENNETT, B. ET AL., PHARMACOGENOMICS, (2005), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 373 - 82 | - SHENDURE, P. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, no. 5741, pages 1728 - 32 | - LEBKOWSKI ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1988), vol. 8, pages 3988 - 3996 | - CARTER B J, CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 533 - 539 | - ZHOU ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 179, pages 1867 - 1875 | - XIAO ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 2224 - 32 | - LI ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, pages 241 - 245 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. S6. USA, (1982), vol. 79, pages 2077 - 2081 | - LAUGHLIN ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 23, pages 65 - 73 | - SENAPATHY; CARTER, J. BIOI. CHERN, (1984), vol. 259, pages 4661 - 4666 | - CARTER, CURRENT OPINIONS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), pages 1533 - 539 | - MUZYCZKA, CURR. TOPICS IN MICROBIAL. AND IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 158, pages 97 - 129 | - RATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, page 2072 | - HERMONAT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6466 | - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, page 3251 1 | - MCLAUGHLIN, J. VIROL., (1988), vol. 62, page 1963 | - LEBKOWSKI ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 7, page 349 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3828 | - PERRIN ET AL., GENE THERAPY, vol. 4, pages 609 - 615 | - CLARK ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 3, pages 1124 - 1132 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - AIELLO ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1979), vol. 94, page 460 | - MUZYCZKA, N., CURRENT TOPICS IN MICROBIOL. AND IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 158, pages 97 - 129 | - KOTIN, R. M, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801 | - THOMSON ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 204, pages 304 - 311 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIOL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3828 | - MCCARTY ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2936 - 2945 | - CLARK ET AL., HUM. GENE THER., (1999), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 1031 - 1039 | - SCHENPP; CLARK, METHODS MOL. MED., (2002), pages 69427 - 443 | - PITTENGER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, no. 2, pages 143 - 147 | - HUARD ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 419 - 23 | - TINSLEY ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 360, pages 591 - 593 | - KOENIG ET AL., CELL, (1988), vol. 53, pages 219 - 216 | - TINSLEY ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 384, pages 349 - 353 | - DECONINCK ET AL., NAT MED., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1216 - 21 | - RAFAEL ET AL., NAT GENET., (1998), vol. 19, pages 79 - 82 | - MCPHERRON ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, no. 6628, pages 83 - 90 | - MCPHERRON ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1999), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 260 - 264 | - HILL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 43, pages 40735 - 40741 | - HILL ET AL., MOL ENDOCRINOL, (2003), vol. 17, pages 1144 - 1154 | - WEINTRAUB ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 761 - 766 | - CSERJESI; OLSON, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, pages 4854 - 4862 | - MUSCAT ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL, (1987), vol. 7, pages 4089 - 4099 | - JOHNSON ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, pages 3393 - 3399 | - SEMENZA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 5680 - 5684 | - SEMENZA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 269, pages 23757 - 23763 | - MADER; WHITE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5603 - 5607 | - DHAWAN ET AL., SOMAT. CELL. MOL. GENET., (1995), vol. 21, pages 233 - 240 | - SHOCKETT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 6522 - 6526 | - MAN ET AL., CANC. MET. REV, (2007), vol. 26, page 737 | - CESPEDES ET AL., CLIN. TRANSL ONCOL, (2006), vol. 8, page 318 | - KERR ET AL., CANC. CHEMOTHER. PHANNACOL., (1987), vol. 19, page 1 | - NEDERMAN ET AL., IN VITRO, (1981), vol. 17, page 290 | - DURAND, CANC. RES., (1981), vol. 41, page 3495 | - DURAND, JNCI, (1989), vol. 81, page 146 | - TUNGGAL ET AL., CLIN. CANC. RES., (1999), vol. 5, page 1583 | US20100189794 | WO1991US04666 | WO1991US08694 | WO1994US08542 | US20000572530 | WO2008US73212 |