EP2832205 - Self-propelled harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bönig Dr., Ingo Humboldtstr. 56 33330 Gütersloh / DE | 02 /
Kriebel, Bastian Mondstraße 79 48155 Münster / DE | 03 /
Cord-Kruse, Christian Rainer-A.Krewerth Str. 14 48231 Warendorf / DE | 04 /
Hohm, Robert Von-Droste-Hülshoff-Str. 3 48231 Warendorf / DE | 05 /
Hugenroth, Ludger Schorlemer Straße 29 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Application number, filing date | 14167006.7 | 05.05.2014 | [2015/06] | Priority number, date | DE201310108208 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: DE102013108208 | [2015/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832205 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2832205 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2832205 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127, A01D43/08 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
A01D41/1274 (EP);
A01D43/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2015/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Selbstfahrende Erntemaschine | [2015/06] | English: | Self-propelled harvester | [2015/06] | French: | Moissonneuse automotrice | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 06.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US Opponent's representative Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2018/44] | 10.10.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.02.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.01.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.09.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2014 | AL | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | MT | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | GB | 05.05.2018 | IE | 05.05.2018 | LU | 05.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | FR | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | AT | 05.05.2019 | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/34] | HU | 05.05.2014 | |
AL | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 05.05.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.05.2014 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 05.05.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | HU | 05.05.2014 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 05.05.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 05.05.2014 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 05.05.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 05.05.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 05.05.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 05.05.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 05.05.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 05.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE102008036378 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [XD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1609349 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0§16]; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2112357 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0029]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2011026807 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5 - page 6 *; | [A]DE3810724 (FORTSCHRITT VEB K [DD]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102008036378 | Opposition | EP2223588 | DE102007004576 | DE102008036378 | EP2112357 | DE102009029559 | EP1051898 | US4487002 | WO2011026807 | EP2591659 |