EP2942047 - Cosmetic product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fey, Sven Kakenhaner Weg 105a 22397 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Möbius, Janne Müggenkampstr. 36 20257 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Retzer, Dana Bilser Straße 27 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2015/46] | Application number, filing date | 14167183.4 | 06.05.2014 | [2015/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2942047 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2942047 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00, A61K8/04, A61K8/02, A61K8/35, A61K8/81, A61Q19/08, B05B11/00, A61Q17/04, A45D34/00, A45D34/04, A61K8/29, A61K8/73 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A45D34/00 (EP);
A45D34/04 (EP);
A61K8/0287 (EP);
A61K8/042 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/355 (EP);
A61K8/733 (EP);
A61K8/8152 (EP);
A61K8/8158 (EP);
A61K8/8182 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP);
B05B11/0078 (EP);
B05B11/1035 (EP);
A45D2034/007 (EP);
A45D2200/053 (EP);
A45D2200/055 (EP);
A61K2800/522 (EP);
A61K2800/56 (EP);
A61K2800/651 (EP);
A61K2800/652 (EP);
A61K2800/654 (EP);
A61K2800/87 (EP);
B05B11/028 (EP);
B05B11/1033 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/46] | A61K8/06, A61K8/04, A61K8/02, A61K8/19, A61K8/35, A61K8/81, A61Q19/08, A61Q17/04, B05B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2015/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kosmetisches Produkt | [2015/46] | English: | Cosmetic product | [2015/46] | French: | Produit cosmétique | [2015/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 23.02.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.04.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2014 | AL | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | NL | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | AT | 06.05.2021 | IE | 06.05.2021 | LU | 06.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.05.2014 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 06.05.2014 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 06.05.2014 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.05.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
IE | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
LU | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03075861 (COGNIS IBERIA SL [ES], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 6 - page 8 * * page 23 - page 26 * * page 12 - page 13 *; | [Y]DE10238450 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0062] * * page 67 - page 78 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0099] *; | [Y]WO2007033896 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9* figure 3 *; | [Y]DE102012211790 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] *; | [Y]EP2708264 (PM INT AG [LU]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] *; | [Y] - BULE M V ET AL, "Microencapsulation of ubiquinone-10 in carbohydrate matrices for improved stability", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, vol. 82, no. 4, ISSN 0144-8617, (20101111), pages 1290 - 1296, (20100713), XP027266323 [Y] 1-9 * page 1294 - page 1295 * | Examination | WO9616746 | EP0900598 | DE20317832U | by applicant | US4144325 | US4248861 | DE3309850 | JPS58180410 | DE4424998 | - INT. J. COSM. SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 10, page 53 | - A. VOELCKEL ET AL., ZENTRALBLATT HAUT- UND GESCHLECHTSKRANKHEITEN, (1989), vol. 156, page 2 | - Oxidative Stress in Dermatology, MARCEL DECKER INC., page 323 FF |