EP2804029 - Lens and illuminating device having the lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Aiai 5F, Hantang Building OCT (Overseas Chinese Town) 518053 Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Cheng, Yangang 5F, Hantang Building OCT (Overseas Chinese Town) 518053 Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Lai, Dongping 5F, Hantang Building OCT (Overseas Chinese Town) 518053 Shenzhen / CN | [2014/47] | Application number, filing date | 14167693.2 | 09.05.2014 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | CN201310180026 | 15.05.2013 Original published format: CN201310180026 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2804029 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2804029 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2804029 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/02, G02B19/00, F21K99/00 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G02B19/0061 (EP);
G02B19/0028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2014/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Linse und Beleuchtungsvorrichtung mit der Linse | [2014/47] | English: | Lens and illuminating device having the lens | [2014/47] | French: | Lentille et dispositif d'éclairage utilisant la lentille | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 02.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2014 | AL | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | IT | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | MT | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012307503 (WILCOX KURT S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0067] - [0073] - [0086]; figures 1,3,12,19 * [I] 5,7-18; | [A]CN201836811U (SICHUAN SUNFOR LIGHT CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]US2012014115 (PARK KWANG IL [KR], et al) [A] 12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]TW201310076 (E PIN OPTICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [TW]) [A] 12,13 * abstract *; | [A]CN202266982U (DONGGUAN OUKE OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 12,13 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2014044926 (LEDIL OY [FI]) [XP] 1-4,6,7,19,20 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 5, line 24 - page 8, line 28; figures 2b,3b *; | [XP]EP2711615 (COOPER FULLEON LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-4,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0026] - [0062]; figures 5,8a * |