Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2802102 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CA2851487 CA3121549 EP14167717 US201313891496 US201715832413 US201916430229 US202117490191 US202318200708



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018227173Global Dossier 09.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201715832413 05.12.2017
US201313891496 10.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12199819Global Dossier 14.01.2025B2
US2023300022 21.09.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202117490191 30.09.2021
US201715832413 05.12.2017
US201916430229 03.06.2019
US201313891496 10.05.2013
US202318200708 23.05.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11700172Global Dossier 11.07.2023B2
US2022021577 20.01.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117490191 30.09.2021
US201715832413 05.12.2017
US201916430229 03.06.2019
US201313891496 10.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11165637Global Dossier 02.11.2021B2
US2019288910 19.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715832413 05.12.2017
US201916430229 03.06.2019
US201313891496 10.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3121549Global Dossier 11.06.2024C
CA3121549 10.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
CA2851487 09.05.2014
US201313891496 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9866432Global Dossier 09.01.2018B2
US2014334334 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313891496 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2851487Global Dossier 10.08.2021C
CA2851487 10.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313891496 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2802102Global Dossier 28.11.2018B1
EP2802102 18.03.2015A3
EP2802102 12.11.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201313891496 10.05.2013