06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
07.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.05.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
25.06.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
28.05.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
24.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.04.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
13.01.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.11.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
31.08.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
03.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.11.2015 |
First examination report |
|
02.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.11.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
14.11.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
14.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
14.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
24.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |