Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10863002 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2020 | B2 | US2018213064 | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815933686 | 23.03.2018 | US201313902242 | 24.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3916617 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313902242 | 24.05.2013 | EP14167806 | 09.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9930142 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | B2 | US2014351317 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313902242 | 24.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2806372 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2021 | B1 | EP2806372 | 17.12.2014 | A3 | EP2806372 | 26.11.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313902242 | 24.05.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3916617 |