Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
08.11.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.06.2016 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.06.2016 | First examination report | |
06.04.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.11.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |