EP2804133 - Package including RFID tag and RFID system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawase, Tsutomu 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Okamoto, Yoichi 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/47] | Application number, filing date | 14168172.6 | 13.05.2014 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | JP20130101801 | 14.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013101801 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2804133 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/073 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G06K19/0739 (EP,US);
G06K7/10009 (US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07756 (EP,US);
G06K19/07798 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Packung mit RFID-Etikett und RFID-System | [2014/47] | English: | Package including RFID tag and RFID system | [2014/47] | French: | Boîtier comprenant une étiquette RFID et système RFID | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 18.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 09.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002126057 (KING PATRICK F [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0042]; figures 2, 3A, 3B *; | [A]US2006017545 (VOLPI JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 5-7* paragraph [0031]; figure 10 *; | [A]US2009027206 (CHANG SHUN-CHI [TW], et al) [A] 2,8 * paragraph [0057]; figure 7 * |