EP2816488 - PCIE Tunneling Through SAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVAGO TECHNOLOGIES INTERNATIONAL SALES PTE. LIMITED No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapur 768923 / SG | [2019/06] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | ||
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1320 Ridder Park Dr. San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voorhees, William W. 4420 Arrowswest Drive, AL101 Colorado Springs, CO Colorado 80907 / US | 02 /
Penokie, George O. 3033 41st Street NW Suite 100 Rochester, MN Minnesota 55901 / US | 03 /
Petty, William K. 4420 Arrowswest Drive, AL101 Colorado Springs, CO Colorado 80907 / US | 04 /
Raghavan, Ramprasad 4420 Arrowswest Drive, AL101 Colorado Springs, CO Colorado 80907 / US | 05 /
Saghi, Eugene 4420 Arrowswest Dr Colorado Springs, CO Colorado 80907 / US | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14169231.9 | 21.05.2014 | [2014/52] | Priority number, date | US201361836282P | 18.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361836282 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2816488 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2816488 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G06F13/42 (EP,US);
G06F13/4295 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PCIe-Tunneling durch SAS | [2014/52] | English: | PCIE Tunneling Through SAS | [2014/52] | French: | Transmission tunnel PCIE via SAS | [2014/52] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 07.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 16.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2423823 (LSI CORP [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0016] - [0021] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2012192038 (CHO BYUNGCHEOL [KR]) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US7496700 (CHONG PAUL [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |