EP2803357 - Angiogenesis inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE JOHNS-HOPKINS UNIVERSITY 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Jun 6909 Sandy Creek Court Clarksville, MD 21029 / US | 02 /
Chong, Curtis Reed Hall 4D2 Baltimore, MD 21205 / US | 03 /
Sullivan, David 117 Hawthorn Road Baltimore, MD 21210 / US | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Ladendorf, Oliver Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/47] | Application number, filing date | 14169291.3 | 27.06.2005 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | US20040583076P | 25.06.2004 Original published format: US 583076 P | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2803357 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2803357 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2803357 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P19/02, A61P27/02, A61P29/00, A61P17/00, A61P17/02, A61P17/06, A61P17/10, A61P17/12, A61K38/50, A61K31/365, A61K31/4164, A61K31/47, A61K31/58, A61K31/7072, A61P31/00, A61P31/04, A61K31/4196 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61F9/0008 (US);
A61F9/0017 (US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4196 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K38/50 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | A61K31/496, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P19/02, A61P27/02, A61P29/00, A61P17/00, A61P17/02, A61P17/06, A61P17/10, A61P17/12 | ||
Former IPC [2020/31] | A61K31/496, A61P19/02, A61P27/02, A61P29/00, A61P17/00, A61P35/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/58, A61K38/50, A61K31/365, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4196, A61K31/47, A61P17/02, A61P17/06, A61P17/10, A61P17/12 | ||
Former IPC [2014/47] | A61K31/496, A61K31/58, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61P17/00, A61P29/00, A61P27/02, A61P19/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2014/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Angiogenesehemmer | [2014/47] | English: | Angiogenesis inhibitors | [2014/47] | French: | Inhibiteurs d'angiogenèse | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05787846.4 / EP1765336 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2005 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | IT | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | NL | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | SE | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | TR | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | GB | 27.06.2021 | IE | 27.06.2021 | LU | 27.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | FR | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 27.06.2005 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 27.06.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 27.06.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 27.06.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 27.06.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
GB | 27.06.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004092740 (DUMAS JACQUES P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * claims 4, 5 *; | [A]US2004067985 (HAVIV FORTUNA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 110 - paragraph 112 * * claims 25-27 *; | [XP]WO2004105696 (COMBINATORX INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-6,11-14 * claims 3-6, 8, 9 *; | [XP]WO2005000208 (COMBINATORX INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-6,11-14 * claims 3-5, 7, 8 *; | [XI]WO03092617 (COMBINATORX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11,12 * claims 19, 23, 26 * [I] 7-10; | [XI]WO9920271 (ROC SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * claims 2, 4, 5, 6 * * page 5, line 12 - line 14 * [I] 7-10 | Examination | US2002193384 | US2003161893 | BE1004029 | - BRALIPISUT ASADAMONGKOL ET AL, "The development of hyperbaric oxygen therapy for skin rejuvenation and treatment of photoaging", MEDICAL GAS RESEARCH, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, UK, (20140401), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1186/2045-9912-4-7, ISSN 2045-9912, page 7, XP021184070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/2045-9912-4-7 | by applicant | US2005137583 | US2004219181 | US2004265356 | US2005031669 | US2005137538 | US2002086051 | US2002106395 | US2002110591 | US2002110592 | US2002110635 | US5378475 | US5773019 | US5902598 | US6001386 | US6726918 | US6331313 | US5824072 | US5632984 | US6217895 | US6375972 | US5807876 | US4680285 | US4451648 | US3870790 | US4226859 | US4369172 | US4842866 | US5705190 | US6638534 | US5541171 | US5217720 | US6569457 | US6756058 | US2005096290 | US2005126948 | - FOLLANAN, J., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1971), vol. 285, pages 1182 - 1186 | - HANAHAN, D.; FOLKMAN, J., CELL, (1996), vol. 86, pages 353 - 364 | - FOLKMAN, J.; KLAGSBRUN, M., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 442 - 447 | - CARMELIET, P., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 653 - 660 | - PANKIEWICZ ET AL., PHARMACOL THER., (1997), vol. 76, no. 1-3, pages 89 - 100 | - PANKIEWICZ ET AL., J MED CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 703 - 12 | - MOHACSI, P. J.; TULLER, D.; HULLIGER, B.; WIJNGAARD, P. L., J. HEART. LUNG. TRANSPLANT., (1997), vol. 16, pages 484 - 492 | - EUGUI, E. M.; ALMQUIST, S. J.; MULLER, C. D.; ALLISON, A. C., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 33, pages 161 - 173 | - ROCHE LABORATORIES, (2003), vol. 1, pages 1 - 34 | - CARTER, S. B.; FRANKLIN, T. J.; JONES, D. F.; LEONARD, B. J.; MILLS, S. D.; TURNER, R. W.; TURNER, W. B., NATURE, (1969), vol. 223, pages 848 - 850 | - KNUDTZON, S.; NISSEN, N. 1., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REP., (1972), vol. 56, pages 221 - 227 | - BREWIN, T. B.; COLE, M. P.; JONES, C. T.; PLATT, D. S.; TODD, I. D., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REP., (1972), vol. 56, pages 83 - 87 | - KNUDTZON, S.; NISSEN, N. 1., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REP., (1972), vol. 56, pages 221 - 22 | - KNUDTZON; S.; NISSEN, N. I., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REP., (1972), vol. 56, pages 221 - 227 | - BREWIN, T. B.; COLE, M. .; JONES, C. T.; PLATT, D. S.; TODD, I. D., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REP., (1972), vol. 56, pages 83 - 87 | - GU, J. J.; STEGMANN, S.; GATHY, K.; MURRAY, R; LALIBERTE, J.; AYSCUE, L.; MITCHELL, B. S., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2000), vol. 106, pages 599 - 606 | - GU, J. J.; TOLIN, A. K.; JAIN, J.; HUANG, H.; SANTIAGO, L.; MITCHELL, B. S., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 23, pages 6702 - 6712 | - LEE, H. J.; PAWLAK, K.; NGUYEN, B. T.; ROBINS, R K.; SADEE, W., CANCER RES., (1985), vol. 45, pages 5512 - 5520 | - SINTCHAK, M. D.; NIMMESGERN, E., IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 47, pages 163 - 184 | - ALEXANDER, J. ET AL., JOUNIAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 31, pages 318 - 322 | - BUNDGAARD, H., Design of Prodrugs, ELSEVIER, (1985), pages 1 - 92 | - BUNDGAARD, H.; NIELSEN, N. M., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 30, pages 451 - 454 | - BUNDGAARD, H., A Textbook ofDrug Design and Development, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBL., (1991), pages 113 - 191 | - DIGENIS, G. A. ET AL., Handbook of Experimental Pharmacology, (1975), vol. 28, pages 86 - 112 | - FRIIS, G. J.; BUNDGAARD, H., A Textbook of Drug Design and Development; 2 ed., OVERSEAS PUBL., (1996), pages 351 - 385 | - PITMAN, I. H., MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, (1981), vol. 1, pages 189 - 214 | - PAN, F.; YE, Z.; CHENG, L.; LIU, J. O., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 14477 - 14480 | - DREVS, J.; HOFMANN, I.; HUGENSCHMIDT, H.; WITTIG, C.; MADJAR, H; MULLER, M.; WOOD, J.; MARTINY-BARON, G.; UNGER, C.; MARME, D., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 4819 - 4824 | - LIPSKY, J. J., LANCET, (1996), vol. 348, pages 1357 - 1359 | - ALLISON, A. C.; EUGUI, E. M., IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 47, pages 85 - 118 | - LALIBERTE, J.; YEE, A.; XIONG, Y.; MITCHELL, B. S., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, pages 2896 - 2904 | - COLLART, F. R; CHUBB, C. B.; MIRKIN, B. L.; HUBERMAN, E., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 5826 - 5828 | - SENDA, M.; NATSUMEDA, Y., LIFE SCI., (1994), vol. 54, pages 1917 - 1926 | - LOIS, C.; HONG, E. J.; PEASE, S.; BROWN, E. J.; BALTIMORE, D., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 295, pages 868 - 872 | - VAN LEEUWEN, L.; GUIFFRE, A. K.; SEWELL, W. A.; VOS, B. J.; RAINER, S.; ATKINSON, K., TRANSPLANTATION, (1997), vol. 64, pages 1097 - 1101 | - FAHMY, R. G.; DASS, C. R.; SUN, L. Q.; CHESTERMAN, C. N.; KHACBIGIAN, L. M., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 1026 - 1032 | - FAHMY, R G.; DASS, C. R.; SUN, L Q.; CHESTERMAN, C. N.; KHACHIGIAN, L. M., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 1026 - 1032 | - TRESSLER, R. J.; GARVIN, L. J.; SLATE, D. L., INT. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 57, pages 568 - 573 | - SALUP, R. R.; WILTROUT, R. H., CANCER RES., (1986), vol. 46, pages 3358 - 3363 |