EP2886113 - Ophthalmic composition for the correction of presbyopia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurocanarias Oftalmologica, S.L. C/Leon y Castillo, 211 35004 Las Palmas de Gran Canarias / ES | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodriguez Hernandez, Vincente c/león y Castillo 211 35004 Las Palmas de Gran Canarias / ES | 02 /
Carreras Diaz, Humberto c/león y Castillo 211 35004 Las Palmas de Gran Canarias / ES | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Monni, Richard, et al Cabinet LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Jeannet, Olivier JEANNET & Associés 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 14169660.9 | 23.05.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | ES20130001177 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: ES 201301177 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886113 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/196, A61K31/4178, A61P27/02 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/196, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4178, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ophthalmische Zusammensetzung zur Korrektur von Presbyopie | [2015/26] | English: | Ophthalmic composition for the correction of presbyopia | [2015/26] | French: | Composition ophtalmique pour la correction de la presbytie | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2019 | Observations by third parties | 25.07.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2019 | 19.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008075149 (BENOZZI JORGE LUIS [AR]) [I] 1-9 * page 2, lines 9-20 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 10 * * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2013041967 (ALTAVISTA INST DE INVEST MEDICA S A S [CO]) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 2 * * example 5 *; | [Y] - BONNIE A HENDERSON ET AL, "Safety and Efficacy of Bromfenac Ophthalmic Solution () Dosed Once Daily for Postoperative Ocular Inflammation and Pain", OPHTHALMOLOGY, J. B. LIPPINCOTT CO., PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, vol. 118, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.OPHTHA.2011.04.035, ISSN 0161-6420, (20110427), pages 2120 - 2127, (20110504), XP028332685 [Y] 1-9 * page 2120, column 2, paragraph l - page 2121, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ophtha.2011.04.035 | [A] - L. DAVID WATERBURY ET AL, "Ocular Penetration and Anti-inflammatory Activity of Ketorolac 0.45% and Bromfenac 0.09% Against Lipopolysaccharide-Induced Inflammation", JOURNAL OF OCULAR PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (20110225), vol. 27, no. 2, doi:10.1089/jop.2010.0135, ISSN 1080-7683, pages 173 - 178, XP055186089 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 173, column 2, lines 5-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/jop.2010.0135 | [A] - JANITA P.C. CHAU ET AL, "A Systematic Review of Methods of Eye Irrigation for Adults and Children with Ocular Chemical Burns", WORLDVIEWS ON EVIDENCE-BASED NURSING, (20110607), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1741-6787.2011.00220.x, ISSN 1545-102X, pages 129 - 138, XP055186066 [A] 1-9 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1741-6787.2011.00220.x | [A] - FRANCISCO ETCHABERRY, "Colirio de suero autólogo", OFFARM, (200707), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 100 - 105, XP055186068 [A] 1-9 * page 100, column 2, paragraphs 4-5 * | [A] - MAGDALENA W ET AL, "New methods of treatment in presbyopia", ADVANCES IN CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE 2010 WROCLAW UNIVERSITY OF MEDICINE POL, (201005), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1230-025X, pages 405 - 409, XP055186091 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | ES2228153T | ES2304824 | ES2337748 | ES2342684T | ES2351515T | other | US2013096199 |