EP2808862 - Liquid crystal display and display method thereof with use of multiple pixels for the display of gradations in a lower resolution mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park Chu-Nan, Miao-Li 350 / TW | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuei, Bo-Chin c/o InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Jhu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Jhu-Nan, Miao-Li County / TW | 02 /
Chen, Chih-Ting c/o InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Jhu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Jhu-Nan, Miao-Li County / TW | 03 /
Chen, Jian-Chen c/o InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Jhu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park 350 Jhu-Nan, Miao-Li County / TW | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/49] | Application number, filing date | 14169900.9 | 26.05.2014 | [2014/49] | Priority number, date | TW20130118731 | 28.05.2013 Original published format: TW 102118731 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808862 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/00, G09G3/36, G09G3/20 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G09G3/003 (EP,US);
G09G3/2007 (US);
G09G3/36 (US);
G09G3/3614 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0443 (US);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0209 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige und Anzeigeverfahren dafür unter Verwendung mehrerer Pixel zur Gradationsanzeige im Modus mit niedriger Auflösung | [2014/49] | English: | Liquid crystal display and display method thereof with use of multiple pixels for the display of gradations in a lower resolution mode | [2014/49] | French: | Affichage à cristaux liquides et procédé d'affichage correspondant utilisant plusieurs pixels pour l' affichage de gradations dans un mode de résolution plus basse | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 04.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5847688 (OHI SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 11-26 *; | [I]US2002149598 (GREIER PAUL F [US], et al) [I] 1,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0058]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0083]; figure 12 *; | [IY]US2004061711 (KURUMISAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,6,7,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] - [0008] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0034] - [0040]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0043]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0063] - [0065]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0071]; figure 7 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]US2013010007 (ITO AKIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0032]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0033]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0039] - [0047]; figures 3-4 *; | [A]WO2013072453 (TP VISION HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1,3-5,10,11 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 15 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 3 * * page 15, line 30 - page 17, line 6; figures 5-6 ** page 18, line 21 - page 20, line 26; figure 7 * |