EP2950119 - System and method for verifying a particle beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ION BEAM APPLICATIONS S.A. Chemin du Cyclotron, 3 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janssens, Guillaume Clos des Sonneurs, 7 1348 Ottignies-Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | 02 /
Prieels, Damien rue Masbourg, 47 1490 Court-Saint-Etienne / BE | 03 /
Smeets, Julien Route de Hannut, 81 5004 Bouge / BE | 04 /
Vander Stappen, François rue de Venise, 71 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Decrock, Patrick IBA Chemin du Cyclotron 3 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 14169907.4 | 26.05.2014 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950119 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2950119 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
G01T1/29 (EP);
A61N2005/1052 (EP);
A61N2005/1087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Überprüfung eines Partikelstrahls | [2015/49] | English: | System and method for verifying a particle beam | [2015/49] | French: | Système et procédé permettant de vérifier un faisceau de particules | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2014 | AL | 18.05.2016 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | IT | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | RS | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | IE | 26.05.2016 | LU | 26.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 26.05.2014 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 26.05.2014 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.05.2014 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.05.2014 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/18] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RS | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012025076 (KRAFT GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1, 5 * * paragraphs [0047] , [0 53] , [0 55] - [0056] - [0 59] - [0060] *; | [Y]WO2012152938 (ION BEAM APPLIC SA [BE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0052] *; | [A]EP2140913 (ION BEAM APPLIC SA [BE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0046] , [0 51] - [0052] *; | [A]WO2012104416 (ION BEAM APPLIC SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 4, 5, 8, 9 * * paragraphs [0057] , [0 61] *; | [A]US2011057110 (TESTA ETIENNE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 38 - line 41 * | [A] - MIN CHUL HEE ET AL, "Development of array-type prompt gamma measurement system forrange verification in proton therapy", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 39, no. 4, doi:10.1118/1.3694098, ISSN 0094-2405, (20120401), pages 2100 - 2107, (20120326), XP012160962 [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * Secion II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.3694098 | Examination | WO2015040225 | by applicant | US8481951 | WO2012104416 | - GUETH ET AL., PHYS. MED. BIOL., (2013), vol. 58, pages 4563 - 4577 | - SCHAART ET AL., PHYS. MED. BIOL., (2010), vol. 55, pages N179 - N189 |