EP2949523 - Weight-independent safety brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beutler, Jörg Spitzwegstraße 6 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beutler, Jörg Spitzwegstrasse 6 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
Günther, Thomas Ringstrasse 48 08294 Lößnitz / DE | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Lermer, Christoph Nove Haus - Design Offices Luise-Ullrich-Straße 14 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Lermer, Christoph LermerRaible Patent- u. Rechtsanwalts PartGmbB Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14169949.6 | 27.05.2014 | [2015/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2949523 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2949523 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/12, B60T8/17, B60T13/66 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
B60T7/126 (EP,US);
B60T8/1705 (EP,CN,US);
B60T13/665 (EP,US);
B60T17/228 (EP,US);
B60T7/128 (EP,US);
B60T8/72 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2015/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Gewichtsunabhängige Sicherheitsbremse | [2015/49] | English: | Weight-independent safety brake | [2015/49] | French: | Frein de sécurité indépendant du poids | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 21.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2019
31.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2019
31.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | 07.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.03.2020 | 18.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 12.07.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | Appeal following opposition | 12.05.2021 | Appeal received No. T0559/21 | 12.05.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 27.08.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 16.01.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2014 | AL | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | MT | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | IE | 27.05.2018 | LU | 27.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | FR | 25.06.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GB | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | AT | 27.05.2019 | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 27.05.2014 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.05.2014 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.05.2014 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 25.06.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GB | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 27.05.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1167142 (WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECH CORP [US]); | [XY]DE10245149 (MAURER FRIEDRICH SOEHNE [DE]); | [XY]DE102011052545 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP1230962 |