Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
12.05.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.03.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.06.2015 | Change - designated states | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
12.06.2015 | Change - request for examination | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
02.12.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
07.11.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 | Change - classification | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
07.11.2014 | Change - classification | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |