Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014353688 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW102118812 | 28.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140139956 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | TW102118812 | 28.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5956499B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2016 | B2 | JP2014232721 | 11.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | TW102118812 | 28.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104180249 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | TW102118812 | 28.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2808911 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | A3 | EP2808911 | 03.12.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | TW102118812 | 28.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI559053B | 21.11.2016 | B | TW201445222 | 01.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | TW102118812 | 28.05.2013 |