EP2790021 - Bimarkers for schizophrenia or other psychotic disorders. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/42] | Bimarkers for schizophrenia or other psychotic disorders. | ||
[2014/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Enterprise Limited The Old Schools Trinity Lane Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 1TN / GB | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahn, Sabine Department of Chemical Engineering & Biotechnology Institute of Biotechnology University of Cambridge Tennis Court Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1QT / GB | 02 /
Levin, Yishai Hashahaf Street 24 PO Box 4782 38523 Hadera / IL | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14170410.6 | 09.09.2010 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | GB20090015736 | 09.09.2009 Original published format: GB 0915736 | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790021 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61P25/18 (EP);
G01N2800/302 (EP,US);
G01N2800/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2014/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bimarker für schizophrenie oder andere psychotische störungen | [2015/32] | English: | Bimarkers for schizophrenia or other psychotic disorders. | [2015/32] | French: | Biomarqueurs pour la schizophrénie ou d'autres troubles psychotiques | [2014/42] |
Former [2014/42] | Bimarker für schizophrenie oder andere psychotische störungen | ||
Former [2014/42] | Bimarkers for schizophrenia or other psychotic disorders. | Examination procedure | 19.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10755224.2 / EP2475997 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.05.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2014 | 28.05.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2014 | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2014 | 30.09.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006099593 (NAWA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * In particular: paragraphs 2, 21-36; tables 1-3; paragraphs 114-202, examples section; Claims 1-20. *; | [A]WO2008090319 (PSYNOVA NEUROTECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * In particular: p. 1, l. 5 - p. 2, l. 14; Table 1-2; claims 1-54. *; | [A] - YANG Y ET AL, "Altered levels of acute phase proteins in the plasma of patients with schizophrenia", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20060601), vol. 78, doi:10.1021/AC051916X, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3571 - 3576, XP002413130 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Tables 1-2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac051916x | [A] - JIANG L ET AL, "Proteomic analysis of the cerebrospinal fluid of patients with schizophrenia", AMINO ACIDS, SPRINGER VERLAG, AU, (20030317), vol. 25, ISSN 0939-4451, pages 49 - 57, XP002413128 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; abstract; Table 1. * | [A] - H. ISHIGURO ET AL, "Supportive Evidence for Reduced Expression of GNB1L in Schizophrenia", SCHIZOPHRENIA BULLETIN, (20081114), vol. 36, no. 4, doi:10.1093/schbul/sbn160, ISSN 0586-7614, pages 756 - 765, XP055137295 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/schbul/sbn160 |